IL HB5060 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment of Teachers Article of the School Code. Makes changes to the probationary periods pertaining to attaining contractual continued service. For the first probationary period, requires the teacher to be employed for 3 (rather than 4) consecutive school terms of service in which the teacher receives overall annual evaluation ratings of at least "Proficient" in the second and third school terms (rather than overall annual evaluation ratings of at least "Proficient" in the last school term and at least "Proficient" in either the second or third school term). For the second probationary period, requires the teacher to serve for 2 (rather than 3) consecutive school terms of service in which the teacher receives 2 (rather than 3) overall annual evaluations of "Excellent". Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER TENURE/3 YEARS
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |