IL HB5057 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Exercise of Functions and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates an Investment Review Commission within the University, to be appointed by the President. Directs the Commission to review the reliability of the investment rating sources and tools used by agencies of the State, including the Office of the State Treasurer, the Illinois State Board of Investment, and the State-funded retirement systems. Directs the Commission to identify any investment rating sources or tools that it finds to be unreliable for the purposes for which they are being used. Directs the Commission to report its findings and recommendations at least annually to the Governor, the State Treasurer, and the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
U OF I-INVESTMENT REVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 | |
2010-12-02 | Arrived in House | |
2010-12-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 | |
2010-12-02 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-12-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cullerton | |
2010-12-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton | |
2010-12-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 | |
2010-11-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-11-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-11-18 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-11-18 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-18 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Second Reading | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-005-000 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-05-04 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-05-03 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-29 | Re-assigned to Executive | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-04-20 | Postponed - Higher Education | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Higher Education | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-013-000 | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading | |
2010-01-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce |