IL HB5051 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides that a health insurance issuer may not require prior authorization for a prescription drug prescribed to a patient by a health care professional for 6 or more consecutive months, regardless of whether the prescription drug is a non-preferred medication pursuant to the patient's health insurance coverage; or for specified prescription drugs, including insulin, human immunodeficiency virus prevention medication; human immunodeficiency virus treatment medication; viral hepatitis medication; estrogen; and progesterone.
Title
PRIOR AUTH-PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Sponsors
Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass [D] | Rep. Gregg Johnson [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Margaret Croke [D] |
Rep. Mary Canty [D] | Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |