IL HB5044 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall by rule establish a comprehensive low-income water assistance policy and program. Contains various provisions concerning the policy and program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds requirements related to billing statements and reconnection of service for water and sewer utilities. Provides that upon request by a water utility, the Illinois Commerce Commission may allow, but may not require, a water utility to establish a customer assistance program. Provides that an entity subject to certain federal laws that serves or provides water or sewer services to a specified number of people shall conduct a cost of service study every 5 years. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that within one year of the effective date of the amendatory Act, every community water system shall create a plan to remove all known lead service lines within 10 years from the completion of the plan. Requires each community water system to implement an asset management plan designed to inspect, maintain, repair, and renew its infrastructure within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt rules for lead replacement that require an expedited timeline for high risk facilities and communities within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Creates the Statewide Advisory Council on Lead in Drinking Water and requires specified community water supplies to create water system advisory councils tasked with various duties related to lead in drinking water awareness. Makes other changes.
Title
DCEO-UTILITIES-IDPH-EPA-WATER
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-870 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 17.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 17.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5044&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5044.htm |