IL HB5038 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates to the Department of Human Services for Grants-In-Aid and Purchased Care in its various regions under the Community Services Act and Community Mental Health Act: (1) $27,000,000 for psychiatric leadership capacity grants; (2) $3,600,000 for eligibility and disposition assessment services; and (3) $5,500,000 for community hospital inpatient services. Effective immediately.
Title
$DHS-COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5038&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB5038.pdf |