IL HB5028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to provide grants to eligible school districts to recoup lost revenue due to an industrial facility or plant closure that is the result of a change in State law or rules. Provides that in order to be eligible for a grant, the industrial facility or plant closure must result in the school district losing at least 15% of its local resource revenue in the preceding tax year during the tax year in which the industrial facility or plant closure takes place. Provides that funding for grants shall come from funds appropriated to the State Board of Education for property tax relief pool grants and a school district is eligible for a grant in the amount of 50% of the lost revenue due to the industrial facility or plant closure. Provides for rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-PLANT CLOSURE GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.170a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5028&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5028.htm |