IL HB5021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that when a public institution of higher education proposes to discontinue operations, it shall file with the Board the original or legible true copies of all academic records of the institution. Provides for the specific contents of the records required to be filed. Provides that where it appears to the Board that any such records are in danger of being lost, hidden, destroyed, or otherwise made unavailable to the Board, the Board may seize and take possession of the records, on its own motion and without order of a court. Requires the Board to maintain a permanent file of all such records coming into its possession. Provides that, as an alternative to the deposit of records with the Board, the public institution of higher education may propose a different means for permanent retention of the records, subject to the approval of the Board. Effective immediately.
Title
IBHE-PUBLIC COLLEGE-CLOSING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1008 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |