IL HB5017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the General Assembly states that it is the policy of the State that the primary purpose of the Act is to protect the health, safety, and welfare of the State through the sound and careful control and regulation of video gaming through a tiered regulatory system of manufacturers, distributors, terminal operators, licensed establishments, licensed fraternal establishments, licensed veterans establishments, and licensed truck stop establishments. Provides that to ensure and maintain a tiered regulatory system, the General Assembly finds that it is the obligation and duty of the Illinois Gaming Board to construe the provisions of the Act in a manner that conforms to State policy and the Act's primary purpose and to exercise its statutory authority in a manner consistent with that purpose whether or not the provisions of this Act are unambiguous or capable of one or more reasonable constructions.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-TIERED REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5017&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5017.htm |