IL HB5016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Removes the fingerprinting and background check requirements for a prospective qualifying patient or designated caregiver. Provides that each applicant for a registry identification card shall sign an affidavit stating that the applicant has not been convicted of violation of a state or federal controlled substance law, the Cannabis Control Act, or the Methamphetamine and Community Protection Act that was classified as a felony in the jurisdiction where the person was convicted. Provides that an applicant may sign the affidavit if the applicant was convicted of a felony under the Cannabis Control Act, but the crime that the applicant was convicted of under the Cannabis Control Act is not considered a felony at the time the affidavit is signed.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS-FINGERPRINTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 130 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5016&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5016.htm |