IL HB5010 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no owner of a dog or cat that is a companion animal may expose the dog or cat for a prolonged period of time to extreme heat or cold conditions in a manner that is detrimental to the animal's health. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL ABUSE-EXPOSURE
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0782 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-003-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-006-001 |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |