IL HB5000 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983, the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986, and the Limited Liability Company Act. Provides that, with respect to entities organized under these Acts, the Secretary of State shall publish data required to be maintained by the Secretary in a machine-readable form that is freely available to the public. Abolishes charges for that data. Effective immediately.
Title
BUSINESS DATA TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 101.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 105 | 115.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 1.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 1.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5000&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5000.htm |