IL HB4998 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Requires the Secretary of State to issue standard Illinois Identification Cards and limited-term Illinois Identification Cards to persons upon conditional release or absolute discharge from the custody of the Department of Human Services with specified requirements. Provides the fee requirement for issuance of standard Illinois Identification Cards and limited-term Illinois Identification Cards. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
DHS-RELEASED PERSON ID CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |