IL HB4996 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to appoint at least one employee to act as a liaison to facilitate the enrollment and transfer of records of students in the legal custody of the Department of Children and Family Services when enrolling in or changing schools. Sets forth the qualifications for appointment. Provides that liaisons shall build capacity and infrastructure within the school district to support students in the legal custody of the Department of Children and Family Services. Sets forth what a liaison's responsibilities may include. Provides that a school district must have a designated liaison by the beginning of the 2017-2018 school year. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DCFS LIAISON FOR DIST
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0781 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 024-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 025-003-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |