IL HB4971 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act and the State Finance Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall create and maintain an animal abuse registry. Requires a person 18 years of age or older who resides in or is domiciled in the State and has been convicted of specified offenses involving animal cruelty or torture to register with the Department to be placed on the registry. Requires a person required to register to pay an annual fee of $50 to the Department. Prohibits a person required to register from owning a companion animal or being employed at an animal shelter, pound, pet shop, zoo, or other business where companion animals are present. Creates the Animal Abuse Registry Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that registration fees shall be deposited into the Fund to be used by the Department for establishing and maintaining the animal abuse registry.
Title
ANIMAL ABUSE REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
510 | 70 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4971&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4971.htm |