IL HB4971 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that petitions for candidacy filed with any election authority shall be provided to the public in electronic form, made available online by the principal office or the permanent branch office of the State Board of Elections, or by the office of the election authority or local election official with whom the petitions are filed. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-OBJECTORS PETITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4971&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4971.htm |