IL HB4969 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall make grants to units of local government and school districts for the redevelopment of unused public buildings into commercial and retail space to be rented at below-market rates to start-up businesses and existing small businesses. Provides that a portion of the space redeveloped with grants and financial assistance provided under this provision is to be set aside for start-up businesses and existing small businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities.
Title
DCEO-UNUSED PUBLIC BUILDINGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4969&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4969.htm |