IL HB4953 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act concerning expungement. Provides for automatic expungement of law enforcement records, criminal history records, and court records of all persons whose arrest or charge not initiated by arrest resulted in release without charging or in acquittal, dismissal, or conviction when the conviction was reversed or vacated. Provides exceptions. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM ID-AUTOMATIC EXPUNGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4953&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4953.htm |