IL HB4949 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Literacy Act. Removes the representative of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity from the Illinois Literacy Council. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may (currently, must) develop an Engineering Excellence Program. Provides that certain actions concerning the new business permitting portal are permissive. Repeals certain provisions concerning the duties of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Amends the Illinois Emergency Employment Development Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Illinois 21st Century Workforce Development Fund Advisory Committee and the work incentive demonstration project. Amends the Local Government Consolidation Commission Act of 2011. Repeals provisions concerning compensation for the Local Government Consolidation Commission. Amends the Bikeway Act. Provides that a designee of the Director of Commerce and Economic Opportunity (currently, the Director of Commerce and Economic Opportunity) may serve on the interagency council on the bikeways program. Effective immediately.
Title
BUDGETING-AGENCIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 322 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3987 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-1007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-110 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-205 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-340 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-575 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-825 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-860 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 630 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 630 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 375 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
310 | 30 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
605 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4949&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4949.htm |