IL HB4944 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Statute on Statutes. Provides that, in determining the meaning of any statute or rule or interpretation by the various administrative agencies of this State, for purposes of determining eligibility for any veterans benefit available from the State, the words "honorable discharge" and "honorably discharged" include a discharge under other than honorable conditions due to post-traumatic stress disorder, traumatic brain injury, status as a survivor of sexual assault or harassment, LGBTQ-related issues, or mental health issues, but do not include a bad conduct discharge or a dishonorable discharge.
Title
VETERAN BENEFIT-DISCHARGE TYPE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4944&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4944.htm |