IL HB4941 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0957
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0957
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2023, with respect to nonroutine changes to the fee schedule, the insurer, health maintenance organization, independent practice association, or physician hospital organization shall provide all contracted health care professionals or health care providers impacted by the nonroutine change with notice of the change at least 60 days before the effective date of the change, that the right to advance notice of nonroutine changes to the fee schedule may not be waived by the health care professional or provider, and that, for nonroutine changes, the information directing the health care professional or health care provider to the information provided by newsletter, website listing, or other reasonable method shall be provided by email or, if requested by the health care professional or health care provider, by mail. Defines "nonroutine change".
Title
INS CD-CONTRACTING PROCEDURES
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0957 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-04-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 368b | Amended Code | Citation Text |