IL HB4938 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that if, in order to qualify for a property-tax exemption, the taxpayer must have an income that is at or below a certain amount, then, for the purposes of that exemption, the term "income" does not include any Social Security benefit unless expressly stated otherwise. Increases the maximum reduction under the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption from $4,000 to $5,500 for taxable year 2010 and indexes the reduction to the Consumer Price Index. Includes disabled persons within the provisions granting an assessment freeze homestead exemption to senior citizens and changes the title of the exemption to the Senior Citizens and Disabled Persons Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption. Decreases the age limit to qualify for the exemption from 65 years of age to 55 years of age. Increases the maximum income limitation under the exemption. Requires the county clerk to abate the taxes levied by a school district on each parcel of qualified homestead property that is owned by a taxpayer who is 65 years of age or older and who had an annual household income of $35,000 or less for the previous taxable year. Amends the School Code. Subject to appropriation, requires the State Board of Education to reimburse each school district for any revenue lost due to the property tax abatement. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-14 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4938&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4938.htm |