IL HB4922 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue a certified registered nurse anesthetist license to an advanced practice registered nurse who does not have a graduate degree, applies for licensure before July 1, 2028 (instead of July 1, 2023), and submits the other required information to the Department.
Title
NURSE PRACTICE-CRNA LICENSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0786 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 15-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |