IL HB4915 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning school districts with from 100,000 to 500,000 inhabitants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-03-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2012-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2012-02-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2012-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105533-1bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback