IL HB4909 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that specified fees for birth record searches or certified copies of birth records shall be waived for all requests made by a youth in care, as defined in the Children and Family Services Act, or a person under the age of 27 who was a youth in care, as defined in the Children and Family Services Act, on or after his or her 18th birthday. Sets forth provisions concerning verification of a person's youth in care status. Provides that a person whose fees are waived must not be charged for verification. Provides that a person who knowingly or purposefully falsifies the verification is subject to a penalty of $100. Requires the State Registrar of Vital Records to establish standards and procedures for waiver of the applicable fees. Limits a person to no more than 4 birth records annually under these provisions.
Title
BIRTH RECORDS-YOUTH IN CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0619 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-001-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |