IL HB4908 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that all children in kindergarten and the second, sixth, and ninth grades (rather than all children in kindergarten and the second and sixth grades) of any public, private, or parochial school shall have a dental examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DENTAL EXAMINATION DATA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-8.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback