IL HB4883 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a barber or teacher of barbering may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of barbering. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a cosmetologist or teacher of cosmetology may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of cosmetology. Provides that an applicant for licensure as an esthetician or teacher of esthetics may take the licensure examination after completing 600 hours in the study of esthetics. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a nail technician or teacher of nail technology may take the licensure examination after completing 280 hours in the study of nail technology.
Title
BARBER/COSMETOLOGY-EXAMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0642 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 410 | 2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |