IL HB4880 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning in taxable year 2010, if residential real property is (i) rented or leased for a de minimus sum to an organization that is exempt under paragraph (3) of Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code and (ii) operated and controlled by that organization solely for use as a community integrated living arrangement, then that property is exempt from taxation. Provides that once such property is exempt from taxation, it shall remain exempt so long as it is (i) rented or leased to the exempt organization for a de minimus sum and (ii) operated and controlled by that organization solely for use as a community integrated living arrangement. Authorizes the Chief County Assessment Officer to require lessors seeking this exemption to annually file an application verifying the satisfaction of these requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4880&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4880.htm |