IL HB4879 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0952
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0952
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power of Attorney Act. Provides that if the agent fails to provide his or her record of all receipts, disbursements, and significant actions taken under the authority of the agency within 21 days after a request by specified persons, a representative of the Office of the State Long Term Care Ombudsman (rather than the State Long Term Care Ombudsman) may petition the court for an order requiring the agent to produce his or her record of receipts, disbursements, and significant actions. Provides that if the court finds that the agent's failure to provide his or her record in a timely manner to a representative of the Office of the State Long Term Care Ombudsman was without good cause, the court may assess reasonable costs and attorney's fees against the agent, and order such other relief as is appropriate.
Title
POWER OF ATTORNEY OMBUDSMAN
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0952 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | To Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 45 | 2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |