IL HB4873 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. In provisions establishing a deferred retirement option plan for members under the State Employees, State Universities, Downstate Teachers, and Chicago Teachers Articles, provides that the applicable pension fund or retirement system (rather than the State Treasurer) shall administer and implement the deferred retirement option plan. Further amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the Downstate Police, Downstate Firefighter, Chicago Police, and Chicago Firefighter Articles, provides that, on and after January 1, 2026, each annual increase to a Tier 2 retirement pension shall be calculated at 3% of the originally granted pension. Effective July 1, 2025.
Title
PEN CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-004-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |