IL HB4870 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Re-assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt a rule requiring students, upon entering the sixth grade of any public, private, or parochial school, to receive the human papillomavirus (HPV) vaccination and requiring confirmation that the student has completed the series of HPV vaccinations upon entering the ninth grade of any public, private, or parochial school. Provides that the Department shall adopt the rule in time to allow students to receive the vaccination before the start of the school year beginning in 2022. Effective January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-HPV VACCINATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2020-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2020-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4103152fNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback