IL HB4863 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 2:00 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 2:00 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Military Affairs to convey described real estate in Kane County. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT MIL AFF LAND CONVEYANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |