IL HB4847 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Expands the definition of "eligible adult" to include an adult who resides in any of the facilities that are excluded from the definition of "domestic living situation" if either: (i) the alleged abuse or neglect occurs outside of the facility and not under facility supervision and the alleged abuser is a family member, caregiver, or another person with a continuing relationship with the adult; or (ii) the alleged financial exploitation is perpetrated by a family member, caregiver, or another person with a continuing relationship with the adult, but who is not an employee of the facility where the adult resides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
320202Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback