IL HB4834 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minors Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that there is a rebuttable presumption that a parent of a minor is willing and able to make and carry out decisions concerning the educational needs of the minor. Provides that no petition for the appointment of a guardian of a minor shall be filed in which the primary purpose of the filing is to reduce the financial resources available to the minor in order to cause the minor to qualify for public or private financial assistance from an educational institution. Provides that the court shall deny the petition if it finds, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the primary purpose of the filing is to reduce the financial resources available to the minor in order to cause the minor to qualify for public or private financial assistance from an educational institution.
Title
MINOR GUARDIANSHIP-EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4834&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4834.htm |