IL HB4825 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-11)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1069
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-11)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1069
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an application for vehicle registration must provide space where the applicant voluntarily may indicate that the applicant, or other approved driver of the registered vehicle, has a health condition or disability that may impede effective communication with a peace officer. Provides that the application shall include a checklist of common health conditions and disabilities that impede effective communication, which the applicant may select. Provides that the checklist must also include a blank space for the applicant to specify a condition that is not listed. Provides that the Secretary of State may request verification of a condition in the form of written statements by specified health professionals. Provides that the Secretary shall provide to the Illinois State Police the vehicle registration information of a person who indicated that the person, or other approved driver of the registered vehicle, has a health condition or disability that may impede effective communication. Provides that the Secretary may not provide to the Illinois State Police information that shows the person's specific health condition or disability, or that of another approved driver of the registered vehicle, without the consent of the person. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall establish a system to include the information in the statewide Law Enforcement Agencies Data System for the purpose of alerting a peace officer who makes a traffic stop that the operator of the stopped vehicle may have a health condition or disability that may impede effective communication. Provides that the Illinois State Police may not make the information available in the statewide Law Enforcement Agencies Data System to a person who has access to the system under a contract unless the contract prohibits the person from disclosing that information to a person who is not subject to the contract. Provides that information supplied to the Secretary relating to an applicant's health condition or disability, or that of another approved driver of the registered vehicle, is for the confidential use of the Secretary and the Illinois State Police, and may not be disclosed to any person.
Title
VEH CD-COMMUNICATION BARRIERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1069 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |