IL HB4822 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Electronic Notification Act. Allows a unit of local government to establish a process to allow people to select electronic notifications through an electronic notification delivery system for governmental mailings that are being sent by United States mail. Sets forth requirements for the process. Allows a unit of local government to utilize the electronic notification delivery system to notify people of information that is not statutorily required upon request of an electronic notification recipient. Provides that electronic notifications sent by a unit of local government through an electronic notification delivery system and email addresses provided to receive the electronic notifications regarding one's property or residence are not subject to the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a unit of local government may enter into an intergovernmental agreement with another unit of local government to provide the electronic notifications and to share data for that purpose. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make a conforming change.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-ELECTRONIC NOTICES
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0856 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |