IL HB4819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Broadband Procurement and Disclosure Act. Provides that no State broadband purchaser may award any contract to an Internet service provider that includes broadband service unless the contract provides specified terms concerning access to and impairment of Internet services. Requires each Internet service provider to make available on its website a clear and conspicuous statement informing end users of the Internet service provider's network management practices and performance, including commercial terms offered to end users. Provides enforcement and damages provisions. Provides that nothing in the Act supersedes any obligation or authorization or limits the ability of an Internet service provider to address the needs of emergency communications or law enforcement, public safety, or national security authorities consistent with or as permitted by applicable law. Provides legislative findings. Defines terms.
Title
BROADBAND PROCURE & DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-23 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-05-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-17 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-17 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-05-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-18 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-16 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 006-002-002 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4819&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4819.htm |