IL HB4819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Broadband Procurement and Disclosure Act. Provides that no State broadband purchaser may award any contract to an Internet service provider that includes broadband service unless the contract provides specified terms concerning access to and impairment of Internet services. Requires each Internet service provider to make available on its website a clear and conspicuous statement informing end users of the Internet service provider's network management practices and performance, including commercial terms offered to end users. Provides enforcement and damages provisions. Provides that nothing in the Act supersedes any obligation or authorization or limits the ability of an Internet service provider to address the needs of emergency communications or law enforcement, public safety, or national security authorities consistent with or as permitted by applicable law. Provides legislative findings. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BROADBAND PROCURE & DISCLOSURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-16HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 006-002-002
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback