IL HB4812 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the final average salary of a person who first becomes a firefighter under the Article on or after January 1, 2011 shall be the greater of (1) the average monthly salary obtained by dividing the total salary of the firefighter during the 96 consecutive months of service within the last 120 months of service in which the total salary was the highest by the number of months of service in that period, or (2) the average monthly salary obtained by dividing the total salary of the firefighter during the 48 consecutive months of service within the last 60 months of service in which the total salary was the highest by the number of months of service in that period (currently, the final average salary is the average monthly salary obtained by dividing the total salary of the firefighter during the 96 consecutive months of service within the last 120 months of service in which the total salary was the highest by the number of months of service in that period). Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DNST FIRE-TIER 2

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback