IL HB4811 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Municipal Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that each disabled employee who receives duty or ordinary disability benefit shall be examined at least once a year, or a longer period of time as determined by the Board of the Fund (rather than shall be examined at least once a year), by one or more licensed and practicing physicians appointed by the Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHICAGO MUNI-DISABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseBill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4058-162Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback