IL HB4800 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that surplus tax revenues may be used to pay for costs of special education, social services, and other costs of a public school district. Provides that for municipalities with a population of over 1,000,000, redevelopment project costs include public school district qualified workers, costs of providing special educational facilities and services, school psychological services, and school social work services, and any surplus balance in the special tax allocation fund at the end of the fiscal year shall be used for these workers, facilities, and services. Removes provisions allowing anticipated redevelopment project costs to be deemed surplus funds.
Title
TIF-SURPLUS FUNDS-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-04-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4800&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4800.htm |