IL HB4797 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Provides, in a provision that limits the enforceability of ordinances of units of local government with respect to the remediation, redevelopment, or improvement of certain State facilities, that a unit of local government shall not include a municipal wastewater agency or unit of local government that is organized under the Sanitary District Act of 1907, the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act, the Sanitary District Act of 1917, the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act, the Sanitary District Act of 1936, the Metro-East Sanitary District Act of 1974, or the Eastern Will Sanitary District Act. Provides that an ordinance or regulation of a municipal wastewater agency or unit of local government that is organized under the Sanitary District Act of 1907, the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act, the Sanitary District Act of 1917, the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act, the Sanitary District Act of 1936, the Metro-East Sanitary District Act of 1974, or the Eastern Will Sanitary District Act, regarding the use of or connection to the wastewater treatment or collection system of the agency or unit of local government, is valid and enforceable by the agency or unit of local government with respect to the construction, reconstruction, improvement, or installation of a State facility on or after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
CDB-WASTEWATER REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3105 | 10.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3105 | 10.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4797&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4797.htm |