IL HB4792 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Water Well Construction Code. Provides that the minimum lateral setback distance between a closed-loop well and a storm sewer, sanitary sewer, combined sewer, or any other potential source of contamination is 5 feet. Specifies that setbacks from footing drains and pits, crawl spaces, and basements do not apply to closed-loop wells.
Title
CLOSED-LOOP WELL SETBACKS
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4792&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4792.htm |