IL HB4753 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Homicide Victims' Families' Rights Act. Provides for the review of the case file of open unresolved murders. Defines "open unresolved murder" as any criminal activity in which death occurred more than 3 years prior to the date of the application for review of the case file under the Act, for which all probative investigative leads have been exhausted, and for which no likely perpetrator has been identified. Provides that the person or persons performing the review shall not have previously investigated the murder. Provides that only one case review shall be undertaken at any one time with respect to the same murder victim. Provides that each law enforcement agency shall develop a written application to be used for persons to request a case file review. Provides that the applicable agency shall conduct a full reinvestigation of the murder if the review of the case file concludes that a full reinvestigation of the murder would result in probative investigative leads. Provides for the compilation and publication of specified information and statistics regarding open unresolved murders by the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority. Provides that each law enforcement agency shall employ or designate a minimum number of family liaison officers proportionate to the average number of homicides in the agency's jurisdiction within the previous 5 years of the date of employment with the maximum ratio of 40 homicides per each family liaison officer employed. Each agency may establish a lower ratio for hiring of family liaison officers. Establishes the duties and training for family liaison officers. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act to make conforming changes.
Title
CASE REVIEW-HOMICIDE VICTIMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-002-000 |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |