IL HB4749 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that provisions concerning automatic voter registration and designated automatic voter registration agencies shall be implemented no later than 90 days after the federal Real ID database is certified by the Secretary of State (rather than July 1, 2019).
Title
AUTOMATIC VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |