IL HB4744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, a supplying municipality in Cook County shall not charge another municipality in Cook County more than the actual cost of providing water to the municipality. Provides that a supplying municipality in Cook County shall post on its website and provide to the municipality to which it supplies water the actual cost of providing water. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall monitor all supplying municipalities in Cook County to make sure the municipalities are not charging more than the actual cost of providing water. Defines "supplying municipality in Cook County" as a municipality in Cook County that either receives water directly from Lake Michigan or buys its water from another municipality that receives its water either directly or indirectly from Lake Michigan and "actual cost of providing water" as the cost of providing water along with reasonable fees to deliver the drinking water. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Creates the Cook County Water Infrastructure Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Agency to make grants to municipalities to fund infrastructure improvements to facilitate water supplies from Lake Michigan for residents of Cook County. Provides that the Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charges or chargebacks, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any funds from the Cook County Water Infrastructure Fund into any other fund of the State. Provides that the Agency may adopt rules to implement the provisions. Amends the State Finance Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI/EPA-LAKE MICHIGAN WATER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 14.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-124-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4744&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4744.htm |