IL HB4742 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sickle Cell Prevention, Care, and Treatment Program Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a program for the purpose of providing for the prevention, care, and treatment of sickle cell disease and for educational programs concerning the disease. Requires the Department to: (1) develop application criteria and standards of eligibility for groups or organizations that apply for funds under the program; (2) develop standards for determining eligibility for individuals requesting care and treatment for sickle cell disease under the program; and (3) make available grants to groups and organizations who meet the eligibility standards set by the Department. Provides that the highest priority for grants shall be accorded to established sickle cell disease community-based organizations, and priority shall be given to ensuring the establishment of sickle cell disease centers in underserved areas that have a higher population of sickle cell disease patients. Provides that the program must: (i) increase access to health care, mental health resources, and pain management therapies for individuals with sickle cell disease; (ii) provide counseling to any individual, at no cost, concerning sickle cell disease and the sickle cell trait; (iii) provide for the establishment of additional sickle cell disease infusion centers; and (iv) provide for the development of a sickle cell disease educational outreach program. Requires the Department to conduct a study to determine the prevalence, impact, and needs of individuals with sickle cell disease and the sickle cell trait in Illinois. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Sickle Cell Chronic Disease Fund.
Title
SICKLE CELL TREATMENT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4742&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4742.htm |