IL HB4725 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if and only if Senate Bill 1657 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it passed the Senate on April 27, 2017, then the Gun Dealer Licensing Act is amended by providing that the requirement that a licensee who operates the business at a permanent physical location that is open to the public, that location shall be equipped with a video surveillance system sufficient to monitor the critical areas of the business premises, including, but not limited to, all places where firearms are stored, handled, sold, transferred, or carried does not take effect until January 1, 2021, provides that a video surveillance system of the licensee's business premises may not be installed in a bathroom and may not monitor the bathrooms located in the business premises, provides the expiration date and renewal period for each license shall be 5 years, and provides that an application fee or renewal fee for a dealership license or a dealer license shall not exceed $1,000 for the 5-year period. Effective upon Senate Bill 1657 of the 100th General Assembly becoming law.
Title
GUN DEALER LICENSING
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |