IL HB4716 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 26-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 26-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in all counties, any change in assessment resulting from reassessment in the general assessment year shall not exceed the lesser of the following: (1) 3% of the assessed value of the property for the prior year; or (2) the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index during the 12-month calendar year preceding the assessment year. Provides that the limitation does not apply if the increase in assessment is attributable to an addition, improvement, or modification to the property. Preempts the power of home rule units to tax. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSMENT LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4716&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4716.htm |