IL HB4709 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the county board or board of election commissioners may use public school buildings as polling places only if a school board or a local school council approves the use of that school. Provides that, if the county board or board of election commissioners uses all convenient and available public buildings and determines that a public school building is needed as a polling place, it shall send a written request to use the public school building to the school board or local school council. Sets forth provisions concerning the contents of the request and the response to the request. Amends the School Code. Provides that each school board or local school council shall have the power to approve or deny, in accordance with the school board or local school council's rules and policies, any request of a county board or board of election commissioners to use a school building as a polling place. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-SCHOOL POLLING PLACE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 11-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 22-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4709&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4709.htm |