IL HB4707 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Accounting Act. Provides that any individual who is the holder of a current and valid license as a certified public accountant of any state who has properly applied to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for licensure by endorsement may perform accountancy activities until the expiration of 6 months after the filing of the application or until the denial of the application by the Department, whichever occurs earlier. Provides that any licensed CPA who is a sole practitioner and who has permitted his or her license to expire or become inactive is required to complete the peer review process established under the Act in order to have his or her license restored by the Department. Further provides that any firm that has permitted its license to expire may have its license restored by making application to the Department, filing proof acceptable to the Department of its fitness for licensure, paying the required restoration fee, and completing the peer review process.
Title
CPA - LICENSING
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0730 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 450 | 14.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 14.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 17.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 450 | 8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |